TN HJR0710 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Substituted for SJR0536
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Substituted for SJR0536
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Pearl Shaw, Tennessee Education Lottery Corporation Board of Directors
Title
Pearl Shaw, Tennessee Education Lottery Corporation Board of Directors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | Substituted for SJR0536 |
2018-02-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/12/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/8/2018 |
2018-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/6/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0710&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HJR0710.pdf |