TN HJR0707 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoa High School football team, TSSAA Division I, Class 3A State Champions
Title
Alcoa High School football team, TSSAA Division I, Class 3A State Champions
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | House | Withdrawn. |
2020-01-23 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/23/2020 |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0707&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HJR0707.pdf |