TN HJR0686 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Reset on Final cal. of Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Suggests removing Nathan Bedford Forrest bust from State Capitol and replacing it with tribute to more deserving Tennessean.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suggests removing Nathan Bedford Forrest bust from State Capitol and replacing it with tribute to more deserving Tennessean.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04HouseReset on Final cal. of Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
2020-01-29HousePlaced on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/4/2020
2020-01-28HouseAction def. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee to 2/4/2020
2020-01-22HousePlaced on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 1/28/2020
2020-01-14HouseIntro., ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee-- State
2020-01-13HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback