TN HJR0684 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Substituted for SJR0544
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Substituted for SJR0544
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
William A. "Bill" Young, Claims Commission
Title
William A. "Bill" Young, Claims Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Substituted for SJR0544 |
2018-02-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/15/2018 |
2018-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/13/2018 |
2018-01-29 | House | Intro., ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-01-25 | House | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0684&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HJR0684.pdf |