TN HJR0675 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Valor Memorial Highway

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize the designation of Valor Memorial Highway in Maury County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-30 Signed by Governor.
2024-01-24HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2024-01-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2024-01-23HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2024-01-23HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2024-01-23SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2024-01-22SenateConcurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2024-01-18SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/22/2024
2024-01-11SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/17/2024
2024-01-11SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2024-01-10HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2024-01-10HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2024-01-10HouseAdopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
2024-01-09HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/10/2024
2023-06-09HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback