TN HJR0671 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - H. subst. SJR 690
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - H. subst. SJR 690
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Kelly Wolfe, Board of Trustees of East Tennessee State University
Title
Kelly Wolfe, Board of Trustees of East Tennessee State University
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | H. subst. SJR 690 |
2020-02-27 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/12/2020 |
2020-02-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/27/20 |
2020-02-24 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2020-02-20 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/20/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 2/20/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/13/2020 |
2020-01-29 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 1/29/2020 |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., ref. to Education |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0671&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HJR0671.pdf |