TN HJR0659 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 702
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

J.B. Baker, Board of Trustees of Middle Tennessee State University

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

J.B. Baker, Board of Trustees of Middle Tennessee State University

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseH. subst. & concurred in SJR 702
2020-02-13HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar
2020-02-12HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/13/2020
2020-01-29HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-01-22HousePlaced on cal. Education for 1/29/2020
2020-01-14HouseIntro., ref. to Education
2020-01-09HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback