TN HJR0655 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Adjourns 2019 session on May 2, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adjourns 2019 session on May 2, 2019.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-10HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-05-02SenateRules Suspended, Concurred, voice vote
2019-05-02HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-05-02HouseR/S Intro., adopted v.v.
2019-05-02HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback