TN HJR0655 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article II and Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Tennessee to authorize appointment of special counsel by the general assembly to investigate, indict, and prosecute alleged criminal activity committed by state and local officials, departments, and agencies.
Title
Proposes an amendment to Article II and Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Tennessee to authorize appointment of special counsel by the general assembly to investigate, indict, and prosecute alleged criminal activity committed by state and local officials, departments, and agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2018-02-28 | House | Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-25 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed for intro. |