TN HJR0652 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to complete a secure border wall on U.S. southern border.
Title
A RESOLUTION relative to the secure wall on the southern border of the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Justin Lafferty [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. John Gillespie [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. Mark Cochran [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 4 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/21/2022 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/12/2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-02-28 | House | Adopted, Ayes 70, Nays 22, PNV 1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/28/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/17/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/15/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/8/2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 2/8/2022 |
2022-01-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 1/25/2022 |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |