TN HJR0651 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Metro Nashville Councilman Doug Pardue
Title
Metro Nashville Councilman Doug Pardue
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] |
Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] | Rep. Jason Potts [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Rep. Mike Stewart [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 5/2/2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-05-01 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-05-01 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 5/1/19 |
2019-05-01 | House | Filed for introduction |