TN HJR0650 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Michelle Kingston, Wilson Elementary School Teacher of the Year

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate Michelle Kingston on her selection as 2022-2023 Teacher of the Year at Wilson Elementary School.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-09 Signed by Governor.
2023-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2023-04-28SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-28HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-04-28HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2023-04-24SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-04-21SenateConcurred, Ayes 26, Nays 0
2023-04-21SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/21/2023
2023-04-21SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-04-21HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2023-04-21HouseAdopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-04-20SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-04-20HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 4/20/2023
2023-04-20HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback