TN HJR0641 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Designates "Home To Stay" by late Jasper N. Bailey as state veterans poem.
Title
Designates "Home To Stay" by late Jasper N. Bailey as state veterans poem.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Rec. for concur by S. Comm ref to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/9/14 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Recalled from S. S&L Gov. Comm. |
2014-03-10 | House | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. |
2014-03-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-06 | House | Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2014-03-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/6/2014 |
2014-03-03 | House | Reset on Next Available Regular cal. |
2014-02-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/3/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2014 |
2014-02-25 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/25/2014 |
2014-01-30 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |