TN HJR0631 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 70-25)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Shelby County, Bicentennial

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shelby County, Bicentennial

Sponsors

Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Karen Camper [D]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. Jim Coley [R]
Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]Rep. John DeBerry [D]Rep. G Hardaway [D]Rep. London Lamar [D]
Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Joe Towns [D]
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Bill Beck [D]
Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]
Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]
Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]
Rep. Martin Daniel [R]Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]
Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]
Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Matthew Hill [R]
Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Andy Holt [R]
Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]
Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]
Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]
Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Jason Potts [D]Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]
Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]
Rep. Rick Staples [D]Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]Rep. Chris Todd [R]
Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]
Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-14HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-10HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-05-01SenateConcurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 5/1/2019
2019-05-01SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-30HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-30HouseAdopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-30HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 4/30/19
2019-04-30HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback