TN HJR0612 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Don't Text and Drive Day," April 27, 2018
Title
"Don't Text and Drive Day," April 27, 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2018-01-22 | House | Intro., ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0612&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HJR0612.pdf |