TN HJR0600 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the United States Food and Drug Administration to consider making Naloxone an over-the-counter medication.
Title
Urges the United States Food and Drug Administration to consider making Naloxone an over-the-counter medication.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. H&W Comm. 3-7-18 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-02-26 | House | Adopted, Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/26/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-13 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/13/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/7/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-01-17 | House | Intro., ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |