TN HJR0588 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 65-25)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

National Drug Endangered Children Awareness Day

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Drug Endangered Children Awareness Day

Sponsors

Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]
Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]
Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]
Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. Jim Coley [R]
Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]
Rep. John DeBerry [D]Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]
Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Mark Hall [R]
Rep. G Hardaway [D]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]
Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Matthew Hill [R]Rep. Timothy Hill [R]
Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. Andy Holt [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]
Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]
Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. London Lamar [D]Rep. William Lamberth [R]
Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]
Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]
Rep. Jason Potts [D]Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]
Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]
Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Rick Staples [D]
Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]Rep. Chris Todd [R]
Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. John Windle [D]
Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-29HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-04-29SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-25HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-25HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-24SenateRules Suspended, Concurred, voice vote
2019-04-24HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-24HouseAdopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-23HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/24/19
2019-04-23HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback