TN HJR0569 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Josiah Olan Christian
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and recognize Josiah Olan Christian on his achievement of the highest weighted grade point average of the 2023 class at Jefferson County High School.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 3 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 3 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-26 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calander Committee |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/21/2023 |
2023-04-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-04-19 | House | Adopted, Ayes 99, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-04-19 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. #3 for 4/19/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Filed for introduction |