TN HJR0543 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the department of education to study and report on ways local education agencies are implementing the requirements of TCA 49-6-1021, which requires 90 minutes of physical activity per week.
Title
Requests the department of education to study and report on ways local education agencies are implementing the requirements of TCA 49-6-1021, which requires 90 minutes of physical activity per week.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-04-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-31 | House | Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2014-03-27 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2014-01-16 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Committee |
2014-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |