TN HJR0530 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-21)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Dr. James Netters

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dr. James Netters

Sponsors

Rep. G Hardaway [D]Rep. Raumesh Akbari [D]Rep. Karen Camper [D]Rep. Jim Coley [R]
Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]Rep. John DeBerry [D]Rep. Ron Lollar [R]Rep. Larry Miller [D]
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Johnnie Turner [D]
Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. David Alexander [R]Rep. Harry Brooks [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]
Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]
Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]
Rep. Barry Doss [R]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]
Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D]Rep. John Forgety [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Brenda Gilmore [D]
Rep. Tilman Goins [R]Rep. Marc Gravitt [R]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Beth Harwell [R]
Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Matthew Hill [R]
Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]
Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Sherry Jones [D]Rep. Roger Kane [R]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]
Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Judd Matheny [R]Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R]
Rep. Gerald McCormick [R]Rep. Steve McDaniel [R]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Jason Powell [D]
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Courtney Rogers [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]
Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]Rep. Charles Sargent [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Eddie Smith [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]
Rep. Rick Staples [D]Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Sen. Art Swann [R]Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]
Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Dawn White [R]
Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. Timothy Wirgau [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12 Signed by Governor.
2017-05-12HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2017-05-11SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-05-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-05-11HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2017-05-09SenateConcurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2017-05-08SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 5/9/2017
2017-05-08SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2017-05-05HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2017-05-05HouseAdopted, Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
2017-05-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-04HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 5/5/17
2017-05-04HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 5/4/17
2017-05-04HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback