TN HJR0530 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Child Abuse Prevention Month" April 2016
Title
"Child Abuse Prevention Month" April 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-03-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-02-29 | House | Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2016-02-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-25 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/29/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/25/2016 |
2016-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/16/2016 |
2016-01-25 | House | Intro., ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |