TN HJR0516 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses support for the storage of gold and precious metal bullion and coins in a Tennessee bullion depository.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses support for the storage of gold and precious metal bullion and coins in a Tennessee bullion depository.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-27 Signed by Governor.
2016-04-25HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2016-04-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-04-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-04-22HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2016-04-20SenateConcurred, Ayes 27, Nays 0
2016-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/20/2016
2016-04-19SenateRecommended for concurrence by Senate Commerce & Labor Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2016-04-18SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Commerce & Labor Comm. 4/19/16
2016-03-16SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2016-03-15HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2016-03-14HouseAdopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
2016-03-10HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/14/2016
2016-03-09HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2016
2016-03-08HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2016-03-02HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/8/2016
2016-03-02HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2016-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/2/2016
2016-02-24HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/2/2016
2016-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/24/2016
2016-01-25HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2016-01-25HouseIntro., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2016-01-21HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback