TN HJR0501 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Charlie Hutson

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize Charlie Hutson on the occasion of his retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-20 Signed by Governor.
2023-04-12HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2023-04-12SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-12HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-04-12HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2023-04-10SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-04-10SenateConcurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2023-04-06SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/10/2023
2023-04-05SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-04-04HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2023-04-03HouseAdopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 4
2023-03-30HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/3/2023
2023-03-29HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback