TN HJR0480 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-25)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Senator Roscoe Dixon, Jr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Senator Roscoe Dixon, Jr., of Memphis.

Sponsors

Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. G Hardaway [D]Rep. Karen Camper [D]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Torrey Harris [D]Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]
Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Sam McKenzie [D]
Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. London Lamar [D]
Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Mark White [R]
Rep. John Gillespie [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. William Lamberth [R]
Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]
Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Scotty Campbell [R]Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Michele Carringer [R]
Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]
Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Tandy Darby [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]
Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Rusty Grills [R]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Mark Hall [R]
Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]
Rep. Tim Hicks [R]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]
Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]
Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Eddie Mannis [R]
Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]
Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]
Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Joe Towns [D]
Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Todd Warner [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]
Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04 Signed by Governor.
2021-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-04-29SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-28HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-28HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-04-28SenateConcurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-22SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-04-21HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-21HouseR/S Intro., adopted v.v.
2021-04-21HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback