TN HJR0477 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-22 - Received from House, refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-22 - Received from House, refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
National "Distracted Driving Awareness Month," April 2019
Title
National "Distracted Driving Awareness Month," April 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-18 | House | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2019-04-17 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/18/19 |
2019-04-16 | House | Filed for introduction |