TN HJR0469 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Sher Powers, 2023 President of Tennessee REALTORS

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize and honor Sher Powers, 2023 President of Tennessee REALTORS.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-11 Signed by Governor.
2023-04-05HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2023-04-04SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-04HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-04-04HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2023-04-03SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-04-03SenateConcurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2023-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/3/2023
2023-03-30SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-03-23HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2023-03-23HouseAdopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-03-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-20HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/23/2023
2023-03-20HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback