TN HJR0461 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/24/2019
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Charles Glynn and Billie Jean Lee, 60th wedding anniversary

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charles Glynn and Billie Jean Lee, 60th wedding anniversary

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-18SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-17HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-17HouseAdopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-15HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/17/19
2019-04-15HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback