TN HJR0459 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-17 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-17 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Calls for a halt to state facilities outsourcing.
Title
Calls for a halt to state facilities outsourcing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-09 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Failed for lack of motion in: Delayed Bill Committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-25 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm. |
2017-04-25 | House | Filed for intro. |