TN HJR0456 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Mary L. Fields

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mary L. Fields

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateConcurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-17SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-16HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-15HouseAdopted, Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-11HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/15/19
2019-04-11HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback