TN HJR0454 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 64-21)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Daniel H. Cox

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Daniel H. Cox

Sponsors

Rep. Harry Brooks [R]Rep. Raumesh Akbari [D]Rep. Kevin Brooks [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]
Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Mike Carter [R]
Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Jim Coley [R]Rep. John Crawford [R]
Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]Rep. John DeBerry [D]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]
Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. JoAnne Favors [D]
Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D]Rep. John Forgety [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Brenda Gilmore [D]
Rep. Tilman Goins [R]Rep. Marc Gravitt [R]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. G Hardaway [D]
Rep. Beth Harwell [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]
Rep. Matthew Hill [R]Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Sherry Jones [D]
Rep. Roger Kane [R]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. William Lamberth [R]
Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Ron Lollar [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Mark Lovell [R]
Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Judd Matheny [R]Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R]Rep. Gerald McCormick [R]
Rep. Steve McDaniel [R]Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Debra Moody [R]
Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]
Rep. Courtney Rogers [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]Rep. Charles Sargent [R]
Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]
Rep. Rick Staples [D]Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Sen. Art Swann [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]
Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. Johnnie Turner [D]
Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Dawn White [R]Rep. Mark White [R]
Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Timothy Wirgau [R]
Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09 Signed by Governor.
2017-05-08HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2017-05-05SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-05-04HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-05-04HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2017-05-04SenateConcurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 5/4/2017
2017-05-01SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2017-04-27HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2017-04-27HouseAdopted, Ayes 88, Nays 2, PNV 0
2017-04-27HouseAll Ayes added as Sponsors
2017-04-27HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-26HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/27/17
2017-04-25HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback