TN HJR0440 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

40th anniversary of Taiwan Relations Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

40th anniversary of Taiwan Relations Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateRe-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2019
2019-04-25SenateSenate Reset on calendar 4/29/19
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2019
2019-04-24SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/25/2019
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/24/2019
2019-04-16SenateRecommended for concurrence by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-04-15SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm. 4/16/19
2019-04-15SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
2019-04-11HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-11HouseAdopted, Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-10HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/11/19
2019-04-08HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback