TN HJR0440 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
40th anniversary of Taiwan Relations Act
Title
40th anniversary of Taiwan Relations Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/29/19 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm. 4/16/19 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-11 | House | Adopted, Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/11/19 |
2019-04-08 | House | Filed for introduction |