TN HJR0438 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 63-20)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Shannon McCloud

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shannon McCloud

Sponsors

Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Bill Beck [D]
Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]
Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]
Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. Jim Coley [R]Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]
Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. John DeBerry [D]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]
Rep. Bill Dunn [R]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]
Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. G Hardaway [D]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Matthew Hill [R]
Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Andy Holt [R]
Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]
Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. William Lamberth [R]
Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]
Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Jason Potts [D]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]
Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]
Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]
Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Ron Travis [R]
Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]
Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-22HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-18SenateConcurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-15SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-11HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-11HouseAdopted, Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-10HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/11/19
2019-04-08HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback