TN HJR0433 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 60-22)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 60-22)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Julie Schwarz, 2018 Christ the Teacher Award
Title
Julie Schwarz, 2018 Christ the Teacher Award
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-17 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-10 | House | Adopted, Ayes 84, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2019-04-08 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/10/19 |
2019-04-05 | House | Filed for introduction |