TN HJR0427 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Charles Kimbrough
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend Dr. Charles Kimbrough for his outstanding community leadership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 BY FAISON MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 70 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 BY FAISON MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 70 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-04 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 0, Nays 0 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/3/2023 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-23 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 76, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2023-03-23 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0186) |
2023-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-20 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2023-03-16 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Filed for introduction |