TN HJR0409 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Michael Paseur
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Michael Paseur of Knoxville.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Mannis [R] | Rep. Michele Carringer [R] | Rep. Gloria Johnson [D] | Rep. Justin Lafferty [R] |
Rep. Sam McKenzie [D] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-15 | House | Adopted, Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/15/21 |
2021-04-13 | House | Filed for introduction |