TN HJR0394 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Received from House, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Urges governor to form an education task force to evaluate state testing, curriculum, and other mandated academic policies and procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges governor to form an education task force to evaluate state testing, curriculum, and other mandated academic policies and procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-23HouseAdopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-16HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-16HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-16HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-11HousePlaced on cal. Education for 4/16/2019
2019-04-08HouseIntro., ref. to Education
2019-04-04HouseApproved by Delayed Bills Comm.
2019-04-01HousePlaced on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-04-01HouseRef. to Delayed Bill Committee
2019-04-01HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback