TN HJR0391 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Action def. in Education Instruction to 2/20/2024
Pending: House Education Instruction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Jeff Cobble, Standards Recommendation Committee for Social Studies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Jeff Cobble to the standards recommendation committee for social studies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-13HouseAction def. in Education Instruction to 2/20/2024
2024-02-07HousePlaced on cal. Education Instruction for 2/13/2024
2023-03-09HouseIntro., ref. to Education Instruction
2023-03-08HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback