TN HJR0385 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-25)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Jaynee K. Day and Second Harvest Food Bank of Middle Tennessee

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jaynee K. Day and Second Harvest Food Bank of Middle Tennessee

Sponsors

Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Bill Beck [D]
Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Jason Potts [D]
Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]
Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]
Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]
Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. Jim Coley [R]Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]
Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]
Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. G Hardaway [D]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Matthew Hill [R]
Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. Andy Holt [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. London Lamar [D]Rep. William Lamberth [R]
Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Larry Miller [D]
Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]
Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]
Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]
Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Rick Staples [D]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]
Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Ron Travis [R]
Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]
Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-11HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-04-10SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-10HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-08SenateConcurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/8/2019
2019-04-04SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-02HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-01HouseAdopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-01HouseMotion to reconsider adopted.
2019-04-01HouseMotion to lift from table adopted.
2019-04-01HouseAdopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-03-28HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/1/19
2019-03-26HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback