TN HJR0372 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Sam Cameron, Pioneer Award, Tennessee School Plant Management Association
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor Sam Cameron upon his receipt of the Pioneer Award from the Tennessee School Plant Management Association.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-14 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-05 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-01 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/5/21 |
2021-03-30 | House | Filed for introduction |