TN HJR0351 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Concurred, Ayes 20, Nays 6
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Tomi Lahren

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to congratulate Tomi Lahren on relocating to Tennessee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05SenateConcurred, Ayes 20, Nays 6
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/5/2021
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021
2021-04-15SenateRe-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
2021-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2021
2021-04-12SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/15/2021
2021-04-08SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/12/2021
2021-04-07SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-04-06HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-05HouseAdopted, Ayes 71, Nays 20, PNV 0
2021-03-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/21
2021-03-29HouseObjected to on Consent Calendar.
2021-03-25HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/29/21
2021-03-23HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback