TN HJR0350 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Candace Owens
Title
A RESOLUTION to congratulate Candace Owens on relocating to Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 1 BY LAMBERTH MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 70 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 1 BY LAMBERTH MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 70 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 26, Nays 5 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-08 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 68, Nays 21, PNV 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0238) |
2021-04-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/21 |
2021-04-05 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/21 |
2021-03-29 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2021-03-25 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/29/21 |
2021-03-23 | House | Filed for introduction |