TN HJR0320 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Chief Marcel Coulon, Ashland City Police Department
Title
Chief Marcel Coulon, Ashland City Police Department
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-03-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-28 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-21 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-03-18 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3-21-19 |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed for introduction |