TN HJR0309 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
DeMolay International, 100th anniversary
Title
DeMolay International, 100th anniversary
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Jason Hodges [D] |
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Sen. London Lamar [D] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-03-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Concurred, voice vote |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-14 | House | R/S Intro., adopted v.v. |
2019-03-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0309&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HJR0309.pdf |