TN HJR0284 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Kennedy Bragg, Mule Day Court

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate the 2023 Mule Day Court Third Runner Up, Kennedy Bragg.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-17 Signed by Governor.
2023-03-10HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2023-03-08SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-03-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-03-08HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2023-03-07SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-06SenateConcurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2023-03-03SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/6/2023
2023-03-02SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-02-28HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2023-02-27HouseAdopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-02-23HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/27/2023
2023-02-22HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback