TN HJR0284 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-25)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-25)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Honoring those who fought and died in World War II and commemorating the 70th anniversary of the end of the war in Europe.
Title
Honoring those who fought and died in World War II and commemorating the 70th anniversary of the end of the war in Europe.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-09 | House | All Ayes added as Sponsors |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-08 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/9/15 |
2015-04-08 | House | Filed for intro. |