TN HJR0271 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Michael Arthur Perry

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Michael Arthur Perry

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Signed by Governor.
2019-03-27HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-03-26SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-03-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-03-22HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-03-21SenateConcurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-18SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-03-14HouseAdopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-03-07HouseFiled for introduction
2019-02-28HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3-14-19

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback