TN HJR0261 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Rosetta Leteria Dover

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rosetta Leteria Dover

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20 Signed by Governor.
2017-04-20HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2017-04-19SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-04-18HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-04-18HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2017-04-17SenateConcurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2017-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/17/2017
2017-04-13SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2017-04-11HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2017-04-10HouseAdopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2017-04-06HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/10/17
2017-04-06HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback