TN HJR0261 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Carroll Graydon Henderson, Elmer Hinds Award, Rhea Republican of the Year 2013

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carroll Graydon Henderson, Elmer Hinds Award, Rhea Republican of the Year 2013

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-09SenateSigned by Governor.
2013-04-08SenateTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2013-04-05SenateSigned by S. Speaker
2013-04-05SenateSigned by H. Speaker
2013-04-05SenateEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2013-04-04SenateConcurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2013-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 4/4/2013
2013-04-01HouseRcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
2013-03-28HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2013-03-28HouseAdopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0
2013-03-27HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/28/13
2013-03-27HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback