TN HJR0239 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 348
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 348
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Christine Karbowiak, Middle Tennessee State University, Board of Trustees
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Christine Karbowiak to the state university board of Middle Tennessee State University.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 348 |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-17 | House | Filed for introduction |